This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:46:47 (UTC).

IN RE: 9500 HALTER COURT, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 IN RE 9500 HALTER COURT, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2521

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 9500 HALTER COURT, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MIKA, BRANDON J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: distribution of surplus funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: re: distribution of surplus funds set for 01/11/2022 at 8:30 am in Dept G ... returned via U.S.P.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Funds in Blocked Account - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation, to Deposit Surplus Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J.