This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:24:57 (UTC).

IN RE: 352 MOUNT ARBOR ST, MCFARLAND, CA 93250

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 IN RE 352 MOUNT ARBOR ST, MCFARLAND, CA 93250 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2513

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Defendants

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 352 MOUNT ARBOR ST, MCFARLAND, CA 93250

THOMAS, LYDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER, CHAD L.

Defendant Attorney

CARA, ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 11/10/2021: Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/04/2022: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re-distribution of surplus funds

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: LYDIA THOMAS' CLAIM TO SURPLUS FUNDS. DUPLICATE FILING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont'd from 01/04/22 re-distribution of surplus funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: LYDIA THOMAS' CLAIM TO SURPLUS FUNDS. DUPLICATE FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 1/04/22 minute order addressed to Beneficial California INC c/o Records Processing Services; no forwarding address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Standing Order-Reassignment of civil cases from Department 12 and Division G to Division L and declaration of mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/04/2022: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re-distribution of surplus funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 11/10/21 Ruling addressed to Beneficial California; no forwarding address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Hearing re: Distribution of Surplus Funds- - No Forwarding address for Beneficial California Inc., unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees - Comment: re Claim to Surplus Funds of Lydia Thomas **PAID**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketClaim to Surplus Funds After Trustee Sale of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 11/10/2021: Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: re: Distribution of Funds set for 12/27/2021 at 8:30 in Dept 12 ... returned via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Funds in Blocked Account - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.