This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:31:31 (UTC).

IN RE: 302 PILGRIM AVE., TAFT, CA 93268

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 IN RE 302 PILGRIM AVE , TAFT, CA 93268 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1122

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

MILLSAP, DOROTHY

Respondents

UNITED STATES ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

CANTERO, RUTH ANN

THE RUTH ANN CANTERO LIVING TRUST, THAT TRUST CREATED THE 10TH DAY OF NOVEMBER 1993, RUTH ANN CANTERO AS TRUSTEE

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A. A CORPORATION

J.P. MORGAN CHASE B=NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION, CTS WESTERN

THE RUTH ANN CANTERO LIVING TRUST, THAT TRUST CREATED THE 10TH DAY OF NOVEMBER, 1993, RUTH ANN CANTERO, AS TRUSTEE

CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A A CORPORATION

KERN COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR-TREASURER

THE RUTH ANN CANTERO LIVING TRUST, THAT TRUST CREATED THE 10TH DAY OF NOVEMBER, 1993

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARRAHER, ALEXANDRIA C.

Defendant Attorney

NESER, ARLIN P.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARRAHER, ALEXANDRIA C.; Defendant; Attorney: NESER, ARLIN P.

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 08/22/17.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARRAHER, ALEXANDRIA C.; Defendant; Attorney: NESER, ARLIN P.

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 08/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $87,414.14 to Dorothy Millsap & Nellie Kuntz & Arlin P Neser Attorney at Law. Completed on 01/09/18. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to disburse surplus funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS FUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: RE: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 11/21/17, 830AM, DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 08/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketClaim to Surplus Funds After Trustee Sale of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: IN RE : 302 PILGRIM AVE TAFT , CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: DATE: 8/22/17 TIME: 8:30 AM DEPT.: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO DEPOSIT FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC.; Served: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketRequest - Comment: FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.