This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 07:17:26 (UTC).

IN RE: 10608 MEACHAM AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 IN RE 10608 MEACHAM AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2688

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 10608 MEACHAM AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER, CHAD L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/18/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: redistribution of surplus funds

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/18/2022: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: redistribution of surplus funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Hearing - no forwarding address for Kym B. Favors, unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Hearing - no forwarding address for Michael D. Favors, unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Hearing - no forwarding address for Mike Favors, unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: re:distribution of surplus funds- set for 01/18/2022 at 8:30 am in Dept G... returned via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: granting petition to deposit undistributed surplus proceeds of trustee's sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Attorney's office, Tiffany & Bosco Date of Letter: 11/11/2021 Re: enclosed surplus funds check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code 2924j(c) & (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, CHAD L.