This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:51 (UTC).

IDA FIGURES VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 IDA FIGURES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0698

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIGURES, IDA L.

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV, STEVE B

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN, AARON MICHAEL

SHEPARDSON, SCOTT S.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

5/16/2017 Minute Order Ruling: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/18/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 5/16/2017 Minute Order Ruling: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO FCA US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/18/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury - Comment: TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less