This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:44:01 (UTC).

HYUN KIM ET AL VS ALNAJAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 HYUN KIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALNAJAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0393

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KIM, HYUN SOO

KIM, RAN JA

Defendants

ALNAJAR, AHMED

ALNAJAR, NAZEM

ALNAJAR, ALIS S A

Cross Plaintiff

ALNAJAR, SALEH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BECKMAN, PETER W

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

08/09/16 MO: Court Trial - Day 2.: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Day 2; Parties Present Plaintiff: KIM, HYUN SOO; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Defendant: ALNAJAR, ALIS S A; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Final Case Management Conference

08/08/16 MO: Court Trial /Final Case Management Conference - Day 1: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: JURY TRIAL 08/08/16; T/E 3 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY DEFENDANTS; Parties Present Plaintiff: KIM, HYUN SOO; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Plaintiff: KIM, RAN JA; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Defendant: ALNAJAR, ALIS S A; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Motion for Leave

08/04/2016; Minute Order: Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 7/12/16, by Plaintiffs, Hyun Soo Kim and Ran Ja Kim. Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. ResID: 17433 *************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION. CONCEDED RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ON FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION IS NEVER WAIVED, WHETHER OR NOT PLEAD. ***************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Mandatory Settlement Conference

07/08/16 MO; Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 3 DAYS FCMC 8/8/2016 TD 8/8/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff: KIM, HYUN SOO; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Plaintiff: KIM, RAN JA; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Defendant: ALNAJAR, ALIS S A; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference 1/5/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Defendant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Complainant; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference Statement - Comment: Joint Final Case Management Statement Filed by Peter W. Beckman, counsel for Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketTrial Brief - Comment: Trial Brief of Hyun Soo Kim and Ran Ja Kim Filed by Melvin J. Thompson, counsel for Plaintiffs, Hyun Soo Kim and Ran Ja Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketWitness List (Combined) - Comment: as testified during trial (clerk's list).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - 08/09/16 MO: Court Trial - Day 2.: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Day 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Original Type: Jury Trial; 08/08/16 MO: Court Trial /Final Case Management Conference - Day 1: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: T/E 3 DAYS; COUNSEL WAIVES JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - 08/08/16 MO: Court Trial /Final Case Management Conference - Day 1: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: JURY TRIAL 08/08/16; T/E 3 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Joint Final case management statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketAmended Answer - Comment: First amended answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketJury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Minute Order-Case Management Conference 1/5/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: On behalf of all named Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Melvin J. Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Peter W Beckman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Reclassification - Comment: From limited case number S1500CL288312 to unlimited BCV-15-100393.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketReclassification - Transfer In - Comment: Upon courts own motion, case reclassed from limited case S1500CL288312.

    Read MoreRead Less