Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:41 (UTC).

HUSSEIN A HUSSEIN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 HUSSEIN A HUSSEIN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Seidman, David, Myers, Brett, Kohler, Greg and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2304

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Seidman, David

Myers, Brett

Kohler, Greg

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

HUSSEIN, SAMI

HANISH, SHAMSON

HANISH, BESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BECKMAN, PETER W

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

PALLA, ALISYN J

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Ex parte discharge orders returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation and order...returned via file & serve

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE WHETHER SAMI HANISH AND SHAMSON HANISH SHOULD BE REMOVED AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATORS AND DECLARATION THERERTO (BESS HANISH APPLICATION); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE WHETHER SAMI HANISH AND SHAMSON HANISH SHOULD BE REMOVED AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATORS AND DECLARATION THERERTO (BESS HANISH APPLICATION); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 12/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re Ex Parte re: Sami Hussein & Shamson Hanish - if should be removed as special administrators (Bess Hanish's petition) 12/15/17 CALENDAR #3; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Case Management Conference

12/01/2017 MO(3): Ex parte Hearing, Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Petition for Probate of Will (Sami Hussein and Shamson Hanish's petition) SAME NOTE RE OBJECTION OF BESS HANISH FILED 09/22/17. 1. Need proof of mailing. 12/01/17 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Case Management Conference

(3) Ex Parte Hearing and Case Management Conferences 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING: RE PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL (LOST WILL) - BESS HANISH'S PETITION SAME NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. No copy of lost will provided or written statement of substance (PC 8223) and evidence that testator did not intend to revoke the will (PC 6124). 11/03/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Petition for Probate of Will

(4) Ex Parte Hearing, Trial setting conference and petitions for probate of will 10/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - SAMI AND SHAMSON HANISH'S PETITION NOTE RE OBJECTION OF BESS HANISH FILED 09/22/17. 1. Need proof of mailing. 10/12/17 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 09/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING (SAMI HUSSEIN AND SHAMSON HANISH PETITION); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via ACS

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTE- 1. Need proof of service to Gamia A. Hussein, Hagan A. Husseing, and Aptsam A. Hussein. COMMENT/NOTE- 2. As of 06/08/17, Amended Special Letters have not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Petition for Probate of Will

05/11/17 MO: Petition for Pobate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need copy of Trust to be filed or lodged.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BECKMAN, PETER W

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of intent to appear by telephone returned via outbasket to Bess Ibtisam Hanish

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order for discharge of trustees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Ex parte discharge orders returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Sami and Shamson Hanish's petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Bess Hanish petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Sami and Shamson Hanish's petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Bess Hanish petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Sami and Shamson Hanish's petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Bess Hanish petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for probate of will (Sami and Shamson Hanish's petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of intent to appear by telephone returned via outbasket to Bess Ibtisam Hanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration - Comment: Letters of Special Administration Shamson Hanish and Sami Hussein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Administrator - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: Sami Hussein and Shamson Hanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-17-001098 10/29/16 Six (6) page

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLA, ALISYN J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER WILLIAM LOUIE