This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:43:50 (UTC).

HURST VS SARMIENTO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 HURST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SARMIENTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURST, CHRIS

Defendants

CARMAN, JASON

SARMIENTO, ANGELINA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKET

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, JUDGMENT, & WRIT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT, & WRIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HURST, CHRIS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 15974 JEAN DR. MOJAVE CA 93501; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: SARMIENTO, ANGELINA; CARMAN, JASON; Party: Names: HURST, CHRIS; SARMIENTO, ANGELINA; CARMAN, JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA PICK FOR MICHELLE SLADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of Service for Angelica Sarmiento, Entry of Defalt , Judgment, Application and Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: for Angelica Sarmiento & Jason Carmen

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, JUDGMENT, & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): NO PROOF OF SERVICE FOR JASON CARMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: ANGELINA SARMIENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HURST, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: New Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.