Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:59 (UTC).

HUMRICK VS SIMBOB ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 HUMRICK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIMBOB. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUMRICK, LAWRENCE

Defendants

SIMBOB, JULIE

SIMBOB, KIM

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: HUMRICK, LAWRENCE; Defendant: SIMBOB, JULIE; Defendant: SIMBOB, KIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: HUMRICK, LAWRENCE; Defendant: SIMBOB, JULIE; Defendant: SIMBOB, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE TO KIM SIMBOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SERVICE TO JULIE SIMBOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA EFFECTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less