This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 16:57:55 (UTC).

HSBC BANK V. EVARTS

Case Summary

On 06/07/2010 HSBC BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVARTS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9359

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.

Defendant

EVARTS, MATTHEW J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATENAUDE, VICTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CLERK JUDGMENT ISSUED ~ calid=1279813 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:06/06/2011, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:donnas2, SystemDate:6/7/2010 7:55:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATTHEW J EVARTS PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $1874.04 COSTS: $267.50 TOTAL: $2141.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: OF INTEREST & ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: COSTS (CCP 1033)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLUSIVE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: RE: MATTHEW J EVARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: MATHEW J. EVARTS RE: ANSWER TO SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PROOF OF SERVICE INVALID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=1279811 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:12/06/2010, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:donnas2, SystemDate:6/7/2010 7:54:29 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: MATTHEW J. EVARTS COST: $62.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 06, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 06, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 06, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 06, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $205.00 for HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 147477. Receipt #527504 for amount of $205.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 578

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC BANK NEVADA NATIONAL ASSN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - VICTOR S. PATENAUDE ESQ