This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2023 at 23:42:10 (UTC).

HSBC BANK NEVADA VS. RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/27/2011 HSBC BANK NEVADA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6473

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, ESTELA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BULLOCK MANDIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2012

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Dept.: Lamont Division A; Result: CONV

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2012

DocketFile Type: NP4170; Comment: Department: ALCalendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSALELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1448.NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF NOR ATTORNEYNO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTCASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2012

DocketFile Type: 4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)); Comment: Hearing Entered.Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSALPROOF OF SERVICE FILED 2/4/2011NO ATTEMPT TO FILE DEFAULT OR JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2011

DocketFile Type: Hearing Vacated; Comment: Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1488101] EventCode:4183, CourtDate:08/04/2011, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:CYNTHIAG, SystemDate:1/28/2011 8:44:41 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2011

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR)PACKET, NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION WHO SERVED: ESTELA R RODRIGUEZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 2/1/2011; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f); Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 02, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 02, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d); Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 04, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 04, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketFile Type: 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B); Comment: Amount of $225.00 for HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A. (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC, check no(s) 032564. Receipt #570901 for amount of $225.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2011

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2011

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less