This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:02:51 (UTC).

HOYLE VS HOYLE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 HOYLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HOYLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0290

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOYLE, NEIL BENJAMIN

Respondent

HOYLE, ELISABETH KAY

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHECK

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: PROPOSED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.