Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:29 (UTC).

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN VS LOPEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0060

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

Defendants

GOMEZ, LIZETH

AVILA, ARTHURO

LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Defendant: LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; Defendant: GOMEZ, LIZETH

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • Cause of Action: Other; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Cause of Action: Other; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; GOMEZ, LIZETH; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,462.00; Holdover Damages: $1,850.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $300.00; Other: $20.00; Total: $4,132.00; Comment: Dismissal set aside due to defendants failure to comply with the terms of the stipulation; Party: Names: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; GOMEZ, LIZETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; GOMEZ, LIZETH; Comment: Money portion of the judgment conditionally dismissed without prejudice. Court to retain jurisdiction in the event defendants fail to comply with the terms of the stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 328 Alhambra Place Delano, CA 93215; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; GOMEZ, LIZETH; Party: Names: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; LOPEZ, ARTURO AVILA; GOMEZ, LIZETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Other; File Date: 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Application - Comment: for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Stipulation for Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Other; File Date: 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less