This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:30:15 (UTC).

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN VS CARSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5910

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

Defendant

CARSON, AMBERLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Awarded Against: CARSON, AMBERLINA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $569.00; Holdover Damages: $758.40; Attorney Fees: $300.00; Costs: $440.00; Other: $25.00; Total: $2,092.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AMBERLINA CARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 217 HUGHES AVENUE , #B , BAKERSFIELD , CA 93308; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: CARSON, AMBERLINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURN VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AMBERLINA CARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AMBERLINA CARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PEAKE, ALAN J, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KERN; Served: 10/12/20177:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 217 HUGHES AVENUE #B, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less