This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 11:21:29 (UTC).

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA VS PERALTA

Case Summary

On 04/06/2007 HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERALTA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5111

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

PERALTA, ANTONIO T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS, JEFFREY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/02/2017

DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2016

DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Sacramento/Returned Original via SASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2016

DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regarding Interest Accrued After Judgment Pursuant to CCP 685.050

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2016

DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: No Copy provided for Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2010

DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Comment: DEFICIT: $20,272.28 ISSUED: 07/17/2007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2008

DocketNP1095 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALI/ATTORNEY JEFFREY A PARIS NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT, ANTONIO T. PERALTA MATTER DROPPED OFF CALENDAR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2008

Docket4082 Debtors Examination - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2008

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Debtor's Examination; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2008

Docket172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $40.00 for HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA (PL-1). Received from HOUSEHOLD FINANCE, check no(s) 32624. Receipt #388075 for amount of $40.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2007

Docket4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
05/29/2007

DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE ONLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2007

DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY: JACKIE BRAZEAL WHAT: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, CIVL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMEMTN OF VENUE AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PARTY SERVED: ANTONIO T. PERALTA PERSON SERVED: ISABELLE PERALTA DATE: 4/7/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2007

DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE BY: JACKIE BRAZEAL WHAT: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF VENUE AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 4/5/07@7:29AM-NO ANSWER 4/6/07@8:08PM-NO ANSWER 4/7/07@2:24PM-SUBJEXT NOT IN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2007

DocketProof of Service - Comment: BY MAIL BY: MARCIE COLLEY WHAT: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF VENUE AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MAILED TO: ANTONIO T. PERALTA DATE: 4/7/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

DocketComplaint - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

DocketStatement - Comment: OF VENUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

Docket845L Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $25,000 GC 70614(A) - Comment: Amount of $300.00 for HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA (PL-1). Received from PARIS AND PARIS, LLP, check no(s) 18938. Receipt #305325 for amount of $300.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2007

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

[+] Read More [-] Read Less