This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:10:26 (UTC).

HOSEY ET AL VS MCMILLIN ALBANY, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2015 HOSEY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MCMILLIN ALBANY, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0375

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCNINCH, CHRISTOPHER H.

PIMENTEL, ARMANDO

ERVIN, JERMAINE, Jr.

ZAVALA, JACK

AHSAN, SAKEENA A.

SANTOY, ANNA

FELIX, SAMUEL

KAZAL, BRIAN

KAZAL, KAYCE

LEE, SCOTTY

BAGBY, CHRISTOPHER

ATKINSON, BRADLEY

QUIROZ, MAYRA

ATKINSON, LESLIE

HERNANDEZ, RENE G.

GARDNER, VERONICA

MCNINCH, TAMMIE L.

NASO, RAYMOND

Defendants

MCMILLIN PARK AVENUE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MCMILLIN PARK AVENUE, LLC

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SU, JOSEPH J

GLADSTEIN, AARON M

Defendant Attorney

STEAD, CALVIN R

Other Attorneys

NAJARIAN, JUBE J

WORTHING, MICHAEL D

RICHARDSON, MICHAEL S.

LUHRING, SUSAN E

CANO, GINO

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

RUEDAFLORES, JUSTIN T

BOARDMAN, NORA R

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O

HEINTZ, CHARLES M.

LU, VERA CHA

FINNERAN, ADRIAN PAUL

NADELSON, ELIZABETH P

SQUILLERO, THOMAS S

LASKIN, TAMARA A

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E

NOZAR, JOSHUA B

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/9/18 Cross-Defendant, FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF SOCAL FINISH CARPENTRY, INC. Motion for Leave to Intervene on behalf of Cross-Defendant Socal Finish Carpentry, Inc. ResID: 32699

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: STAY LIFTED 12/21/2017; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proofs of Service multiple- missing attachment list of Documents served. Returned Via File N Serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; NOTICE OF STAY

Further Case Management Conference

03/25/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (Cont'd from 11/16/15; 01/04/16); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R

Case Management Conference

Minute Order - CMC - 01/04/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Original Setting) (Cont'd from Early CMC on 11/16/15)

Case Management Conference

Minute Order - (early) CMC - 11/16/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ****EARLY SETTING/COMPLEX CASE*** (CMC ADVANCED FROM 01/04/16) (Cont'f from 10/15/16) CMO due 11/09/15; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J; Plaintiff; Attorney: SU, JOSEPH J

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Minute Order - OSC 3.110 - 10/15/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Request for Dismissal: Loman Painters was Dismissed on 11/21/2018

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 01/03/19, 03/06/19 Status of Mediation/inspections, Status X complaint and Special Master,Pretrial Orders

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Calvin R. Stead For: request for Dismissal Reason: Please refer to first rejection. Cross Defendant's name does not conform to Cross Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Calvin R. Stead For: Request for Dismissal Reason: Party name does not conform to Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Calvin R. Stead For: Status Report Reason: Hearing date is incorrect.

Ruling

Minute Order 06/17/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Continued from 01/03/2019; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Calvin R. Stead For: Stipulation and Order Reason: Filing fees must be submitted at the time of filing.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 06/21/18 status of X Complaint, and review OBJ TO PTO; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WORTHING, MICHAEL D

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: cont'd from 02/11/20 **Continued pursuant to standing order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal Pablo Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the XDeft Pablo Lopez Drywall - ONLY - With Prejudice - from the XComplaint of McMillin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Dismissing Cross-Defendant Century Landscape With Prejudice -GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal TK Pacific Majestic Roofing Western Insulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the XDeft's TK Pacific, Majestic Roofing and Western Insulation - ONLY - With Prejudice - from the XComplaint of McMillin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Request for Dismissal: Grijalva dismissed on 1/6/2020 and Loman dismissed on 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: Notice of Ruling re Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Why Complaint should not be dismissed pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
392 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of Change of Handling Attorney within Firm from Aaron M. Gladstein to Joseph J. Su

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: 2ND REJECTION / Proof of service party served does not conform to the complaint on file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Minute Order - OSC 3.110 - 10/15/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE PARTY SERVED DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT ON FILE RETURNED VIA US POSTAL AS COURTESY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to McMillin Albany, LLC personal service 9/29/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of service party served does not conform to the complaint on file. returned as a one time courtesy via US postal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/15/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Finneran, Adrian Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDSON, MICHAEL S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Worthing, Michael D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laskin, Tamara Ann