This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:48 (UTC).

HORTA VS MANJARES

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 HORTA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANJARES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0079

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HORTA, BLANCA JANET TORRES

Respondent

MANJARES, JAVIER REMBERTO QUIJADA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: HORTA, BLANCA JANET TORRES; MANJARES, JAVIER REMBERTO QUIJADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: HORTA, BLANCA JANET TORRES; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less