This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 03:07:46 (UTC).

HOOK VS HED INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 HOOK filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HED INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0838

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOOK, DAVID

Defendants

HED INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HODGES, JOSHUA

ECCLESTON, JUSTIN

HODGES, SCOTT

DAUSTER, MIKE

MCKINDLEY, KIRK

HED INDUSTRIES LLC

WISE ELECTRIC & COMMUNICATIONS INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANCHARD, LONNIE C

Defendant Attorney

SZEWCZYK, JOHN R

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/2/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS; TO COMPLETE SERVICE, SERVE THE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT WITH THE ENDORSED COPIES OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: AMENDED SUMMONS AND AMENDMENT; DOCUMENTS NEED TO BE THEIR OWN LEAD DOCUMENTS.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 4-9-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: FCMC 05/14/18; JURY TRIAL 05/14/18; T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Minute Order Dated 4-9-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint of Defendant Wise Electric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Doe 1: Wise Electric & Communications Inc. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof Of Service of Summons to Mike Dauster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons to Kirk Mckindley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons for Justin Eccleston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons for HED Industries LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO HED INDUSTRIES LLC, JOSHUA HODGES, SCOTT HODGES, MIKE DAUSTER, JUSTIN ECCLESTON AND KIRK MCKINDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/2/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.