This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:09 (UTC).

HOLMES VS HOFFMAN

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 HOLMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOFFMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0224

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLMES, PAULINE

Defendant

HOFFMAN, CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/17/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: Order for Claim to Right of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketClaim to Right of Possession and Notice of Hearing - Comment: received from Sheriff Dept on behalf of Donald deJarnette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 11/17/2017:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/17/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HOLMES, PAULINE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 6644 LAS FLORES INYOKERN, CA 93527; Awarded Against: HOFFMAN, CHARLES; Party: Names: HOLMES, PAULINE; HOFFMAN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HOLMES, PAULINE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.