This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:54:53 (UTC).

H.M. HOLLOWAY, INC. VS GANN

Case Summary

On 05/06/2015 H M HOLLOWAY, INC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against GANN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Errea, Larry A., Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0405

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Errea, Larry A.

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H.M. HOLLOWAY, INC.

Defendant

GANN, NICK L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAZE, JAMES J

Attorney at BORTON PETRINI LLP

5060 California Ave #700

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Defendant Attorney

SEGURA, NATASHA E

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

PETITION FOR HARASSMENT: Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: LONG CAUSE HEARING; Parties Present Plaintiff: H.M. HOLLOWAY, INC.; Attorney: BRAZE, JAMES J; Defendant: GANN, NICK L.; Attorney: SEGURA, NATASHA E

Petition for Harassment

PETITION FOR HARASSMENT: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAZE, JAMES J

Petition for Harassment

MO-PETITION FOR HARASSMENT: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRAZE, JAMES J

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: BRAZE, JAMES J; H.M. HOLLOWAY, INC.; Awarded Against: GANN, NICK L.; SEGURA, NATASHA E; Party: Names: H.M. HOLLOWAY, INC.; GANN, NICK L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketProtective Order Entered into CLETS System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - PETITION FOR HARASSMENT: Judicial Officer(s): Errea, Larry A., Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: LONG CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer(s): Errea, Larry A., Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketResponse to Request for Restraining Order - Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO EFRAIN MONTOYA, MIKE WILCOX, CHAD WRIGHT, NATASHA ELLEN SEGURA-WEBB, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - MO-PETITION FOR HARASSMENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) - Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PREVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PREVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketPetition Workplace Violence - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.