This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 08:27:16 (UTC).

HICKLE VS LAGUNA ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 HICKLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAGUNA ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Hopper, Tina and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0805

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Hopper, Tina

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKLE, ALOMA

Defendants

LAGUNA ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAGUNA ASSET MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTLEY, JURA A.

Defendant Attorney

STAPLES, WILLIAM H

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jura Hartley Re: Notice of Jury Deposit Reason: Duplicate. Jury Fees have already been paid for Plaintiff Aloma Hickle as of 10/15/2020. Thank you.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: to post jury fees if jury trial is going to be requested

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/06/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 8/30/2021 (17) T/E 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jura Hartley Re: Notice of Jury Deposit Reason: Duplicate. Jury Fees have already been paid for Plaintiff Aloma Hickle as of 10/15/2020. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/16/2020: Case Management Conference 10/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to post jury fees if jury trial is going to be requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 09/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Hopper, Tina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Laguna Asset Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Laguna Asset Management, Inc., a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/06/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laguna Asset Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Staples, William H.