This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:32 (UTC).

HERRERA VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 HERRERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4050

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERRERA, JUAN JOSE

Respondent

TORRES, GRACIELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.