This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:07 (UTC).

HERRERA, Jr. VS HERRERA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 HERRERA, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Malahowski, Roy F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0075

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Malahowski, Roy F.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.

Respondent

HERRERA, DIANA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Compel Compliance with Disclosures

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Respondent: HERRERA, DIANA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Respondent: HERRERA, DIANA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Respondent: HERRERA, DIANA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Respondent: HERRERA, DIANA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Malahowski, Roy F.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Respondent: HERRERA, DIANA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Hearing of: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Compel Compliance with Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Hearing of: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Compel Compliance with Disclosures Hearing Date: 01/31/2020 Hearint Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 06/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Modify Child Custody & Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Isaias Herrera, Jr. Date of Letter: 06/07/2018 Re: Court Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 05/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Malahowski, Roy F.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Child Custody & Visitation Mediation Date: 05/09/2017 Hearing Date: 05/12/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: HERRERA, ISAIAS, Jr.; Served: 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less