This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:19 (UTC).

HERNANDO VS ROSEDALE PAWN, INC., CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 HERNANDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROSEDALE PAWN, INC , CORP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S., Robertson, Murray J. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2957

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO, SEVERO

Defendants

ROSEDALE PAWN SHOP, INC., CORP

PELOQUIN, BILL

ROSEDALE PAWN, INC., CORP

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 01/22/2018: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: HERNANDO, SEVERO; Defendant: ROSEDALE PAWN, INC., CORP; Defendant: PELOQUIN, BILL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Appeal - Judgment - After Trial De Novo; Judgment - Monetary and Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: PELOQUIN, BILL; No Judgment Awarded; Awarded Against: HERNANDO, SEVERO; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $75.00; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 05/01/2018; Status Comment: BILL PELOQUIN IS ENTITLED TO COST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRemittitur Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Small Claims Appeal; Type: Action; Filed By: 12189; Filed Against: 12189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Small Claims Appeal; File Date: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: HERNANDO, SEVERO; Awarded Against: PELOQUIN, BILL; Amount; Damages: $3,225.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $3275.00; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 01/22/2018; Status Comment: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF ROSEDALE PAWN, INC. AGAINST PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/22/2018: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO ROSEDALE PAWN INC BY PAMELA LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO ROSEDALES PAWN, INC., CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO BILL PELOQUIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HERNANDO, SEVERO; Served: 10/25/2017; Served: 10/18/20175:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.