This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 07:16:03 (UTC).

Hernandez VS Kern Recreational Association, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Hernandez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kern Recreational Association, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern River Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kern River Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Sol de Maria Morales

Hernandez

Defendant

Kern Recreational Association, LLC

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Original Type: Ruling; Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: Proof of Service (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRuling - Original Type: Ruling; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketRequest - Comment: Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: Hernandez, Sol de Maria Morales; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Plaintiffs Claim and Order (SC-100)

    Read MoreRead Less