This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 19:22:25 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS JAKOV DULCICH AND SONS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JAKOV DULCICH AND SONS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2415

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ, HIPOLITO

HIPOLITO HERNANDEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

JAKOV DULCICH AND SONS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

JAKOV DULCICH AND SONS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ACKERMANN, CRAIG J

SEYEDFARSHI, AMIR H

Defendant Attorney

KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Address: #2 must state the attorney's name who information is being updated.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Address: Document is uploaded upside down and has already been accepted 12/11/20

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: of CMC Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Address: Document is uploaded upside down and has already been accepted 12/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Address: #2 must state the attorney's name who information is being updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Jakov Dulcich and Sons, LLC by Substituted Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K