Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:59:55 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 HERNANDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Compton, James L. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1651

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Compton, James L.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ, BRITTANY

Respondent

HERNANDEZ, TORIBIO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FILED BY DCSS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less