Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:07:58 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS FLORES (C)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 HERNANDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FLORES C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Gill, Susan M. and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4046

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ, MARGARITA

Respondent

FLORES, MANUEL ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: SET FROM 12/04/18 T/D: 02/25/19 8:30 a.m. DIV. C

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 9/19/18 11/06/18

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS *ALSO ON DIV C CAL*

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/17/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter - Comment: SPANISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: 3/5/19 NOTICE OF FCCR 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: STATUS ENDS 3/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 4/15/2019 DIV. C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulation/Agreement in Court (FL/DCSS); Comment: DCSS NOM STND ORDERS INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 12/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: GRANTED IN WHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: PAS TAX PREPARATION , NOTARY PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less