Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:17:23 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS FERRER

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERRER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2419

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ, CARLOS

Defendants

GARCIA, ROBERTO FERRER

FERRER, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIVERA, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice, Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIVERA, DAVID J