Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 08:10:22 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ NVS HORIZON NUT, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 HERNANDEZ NVS HORIZON NUT, LLC was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0724

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ, ELISEO

ELISEO HERNADEZ ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHER SIMILARLY SITUATED CURRENT AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF DEFENDANTS

Defendant

HORIZON NUT, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASTEBAR, FARZAD

Defendant Attorney

DODD, MEGAN N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Horizon Nut, LLC, a Limited Liability Company via sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees - Comment: Complex Case Fee/Answer filed 5/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/13/202111:08 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/16/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON NUT, LLC. is a litigant