This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 12:56:39 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ MONDRAGON VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 HERNANDEZ MONDRAGON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1876

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ MONDRAGON, JAVIER

Defendants

SANCHEZ, EMANUEL LUIS

MONDRAGON, FELIPA

ROQUEYESCA, FELIPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYES, NICHOLAS F

Defendant Attorney

HUMMEL, BRIAN G

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/17/2018: Case Management Conference 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: REYES, NICHOLAS F

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Certificate of progress rejected. Please select a adate and re-submit. Returned via First legal.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT, RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/17/2018: Case Management Conference 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury - Comment: Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of due diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of certificate of progress; affidavit of due diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: on First Amended Complaint (COPY RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: COPY RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT, RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/28/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less