This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 20:15:52 (UTC).

HERITAGE ENGINEERING, LLC VS ADVANCE IMAGING CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 HERITAGE ENGINEERING, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ADVANCE IMAGING CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Woodward, Cory J. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0065

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERITAGE ENGINEERING, LLC

Defendant

ADVANCE IMAGING CENTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVA, WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

ABRAMS, ALAN K.

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Commercial UD case filed 4-14-16: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - UD FILED 4-14-16: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ABRAMS, ALAN K.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - UD FILED 4-14-16: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ABRAMS, ALAN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Commercial UD case filed 4-14-16: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Non-Waiver of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: Answer/Response Civil Limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HERITAGE ENGINEERING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.