This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2022 at 20:56:15 (UTC).

HERC RENTALS VS S.G. BANK

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 HERC RENTALS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S G BANK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0655

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERC RENTALS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

S.G. BANKS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOPOURIAN, JULIE M.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopurian Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform to complaint

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Summons does not conform to complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Summons; Summons does not conform to Complaint. Summons must conform word for word.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Judgment does not comply with CRC 3.1806; First Cause of Action is for Breach of Contract. The original contract must be lodged with the Court or a Declaration and Order is needed requesting the use of copies in lieu of originals. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Judgment; Plaintiff does not conform to the Complaint. Please revise and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: Incomplete Debtor's name

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: Correction needed

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: County Name left blank

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: County Name left blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: Correction needed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopourian Re: Writ of Execution Reason: Incomplete Debtor's name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: HERC RENTALS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Awarded Against: S.G. BANKS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Amount; Damages: $42,807.91; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $8,561.58; Attorney Fees: $2,450.57; Costs: $810.32; Total: $54630.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: against defendant S.G. Banks, Inc., A California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Judgment; Plaintiff does not conform to the Complaint. Please revise and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: accepting the use of copies in lieu of originals.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Judgment does not comply with CRC 3.1806; First Cause of Action is for Breach of Contract. The original contract must be lodged with the Court or a Declaration and Order is needed requesting the use of copies in lieu of originals. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to S.G. Banks, Inc. a California corporation on Complaint filed 3/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to S.G. Banks, Inc, a California Corporation via sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Summons; Summons does not conform to Complaint. Summons must conform word for word.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Summons does not conform to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/21/20219:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/08/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Julie Chopurian Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOPOURIAN, JULIE M