This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 08:05:37 (UTC).

HERC RENTALS INC. VS BH WARNE CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 HERC RENTALS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BH WARNE CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1799

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERC RENTALS INC.

Defendants

WARNE, BRANDON

BH WARNE CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A

Defendant Attorney

STREET NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

07/21/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

07/20/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

07/21/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/15/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Answer to Complaint

09/15/2022: Answer to Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BH WAME CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION|DEFENDANT - WARNE, BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Defendan't name must be consistent throughout the document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 11/03/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HERC RENTALS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HERC RENTALS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HERC RENTALS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BH WARNE CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA B is a litigant

Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STREET NICHOLAS J.