Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:30:25 (UTC).

HENRY A AND BETTY C DANIELS FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 HENRY A AND BETTY C DANIELS FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2929

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DANIELS, WILLIAM SCOTT

GALLARDO, RACHEL

Not Classified By Court

DANIELS, HENRY A

DANIELS, BETTY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CLARK, SUSAN E L

HULSY, JAMES R

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: to Susan E. Clark

Petition

Final Accounting 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING CMC re petition seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste of trust assets and failure to properly distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees and costs [probate code sections 17200 and 850 et. seq.] 08/15/19 CALENDAR #02

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation...returned via AMS

Final Accounting

Petition 03/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING First account and report of successor trustee, petition for its settlement, for trustee's fees and for reimbursement of trust expenses COMMENT: 1. Need supplement that addresses remaining issues identified in first account and report 2. Need original bank statements 03/27/19 CALENDAR #1

Petition

Petition 09/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste of trust assets and failure to property distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs [Probate Code sections 17200 and 850 et seq.]. (continued from 05/31/2018)

Petition

Petition 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste or trust assets and failure to properly distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs [Probate codes sections 17200 and 850 et seq] ***Continued from 12/14/17***; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CLARK, SUSAN E L

Ruling

12/13/17 MO Ruling-Continuance: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition seeking redress...returned via SASE

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause 12/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING order to show cause in re: dismissal (matter settled) COMMENT: 1. Request for dismissal not filed

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 11/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: filing of settlement agreement approved and signed by the court

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulated Order approving settlement is missing Attorney Clark's signature

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/07/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held

Petition

Petition 06/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION SEEKING REDRESS FOR SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE'S BREACH OF TRUST, FOR ORDER DIRECTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BE SURCHARGED FOR COMMITTING WASTE OF TRUST ASSETS AND FAILURE TO PROPERLY DISTRIBUTE TRUST ASSETS TO THE BENEFICIARIES, AND FOR DAMAGES, ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND COSTS [Probate Code sections 17200 and 850 et seq.] 06/05/19 CALENDAR #02

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re-submission of objections

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OBJECTION, ETC.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OBJECTION, ETC.

Petition

Petition 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, etc. NOTES RELATE TO OBJECTION ONLY Notes: 1. Response not served on nonpetitioner beneficiaries

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL (MATTER SETTLED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: to Susan E. Clark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: of hearing on order to show cause re dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 12/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING order to show cause in re: dismissal (matter settled) COMMENT: 1. Request for dismissal not filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 11/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: filing of settlement agreement approved and signed by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Comment: Stipulated Order approving Settlement after Settlement Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: James R. Hulsy Date of Letter: 10/21/19 Re: Stipulated order approving settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulated Order approving settlement is missing Attorney Clark's signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Accounting - Final Accounting 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING CMC re first account and report 08/15/19 CALENDAR #01

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 09/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste of trust assets and failure to property distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs [Probate Code sections 17200 and 850 et seq.]. (continued from 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, etc. NOTES RELATE TO OBJECTION ONLY Notes: 1. Response not served on nonpetitioner beneficiaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response of Rachel Gallardo to William Daniel Scott's petition seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to de surcharge for committing waste of trust assets and failure to property distribute trust assets to beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste or trust assets and failure to properly distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs [Probate codes sections 17200 and 850 et seq] ***Continued from 12/14/17***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 12/13/17 MO Ruling-Continuance: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition seeking redress for successor trustee's breach of trust, for order directing successor trustee to be surcharged for committing waste or trust assets and failure to properly distribute trust assets to the beneficiaries, and for damages, attorney's fees, and costs [Probate codes sections 17200 and 850 et seq]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition seeking redress...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK, SUSAN E L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HULSY, JAMES R