This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:50:56 (UTC).

HENDRIX VS REDE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 HENDRIX filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REDE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1450

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENDRIX, JOSUE

Defendant

REDE, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DALEY, CHRISTA

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

Demurrer 05/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Parties Present Plaintiff: HENDRIX, JOSUE; Defendant; Attorney: DALEY, CHRISTA

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 05/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (UD) - Comment: Without prejudice, Entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: *AMENDED* STEVE REDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketDemurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketOrder Sustaining Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: AMENDED RETURNED BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE TO LATINOS DOCUMENT ASSISTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HENDRIX, JOSUE; Served: 04/05/201711:06 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 528 MONTEREY STREET APT. D BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK AS TO JOSUE HENDRIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO JOSUE HENDRIX

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.