This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 08:04:03 (UTC).

HELMANDI VS REYES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 HELMANDI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELMANDI, ROSHAWN

Defendants

REYES, JAVIER

REYES, JACKIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 15558 L, Street #C Mojave, CA 93501; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: REYES, JACKIE; REYES, JAVIER; Party: Names: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN; REYES, JACKIE; REYES, JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN- RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: $17.33 of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Jackie Reyes and Javier Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 to 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Javier Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Any Person Claiming any right to possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Jackie Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.