This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 08:03:17 (UTC).

HELMANDI VS PEREZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 HELMANDI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0090

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELMANDI, ROSHAWN

Defendants

PEREZ, DOLORES MARIE

PEREZ, KENNETH LEROY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 15558 L STREET #A MOJAVE, CA 93501; Awarded Against: PEREZ, DOLORES MARIE; PEREZ, KENNETH LEROY; Party: Names: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN; PEREZ, DOLORES MARIE; PEREZ, KENNETH LEROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County. Pick up Joe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: $17.33 of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: Dolores Marie Perez and Kenneth Leroy Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 to 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c): Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DISMISSAL, DEFAULT, JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT, & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR KENNETH LEROY PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ameded summons and amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HELMANDI, ROSHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.