This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:07:46 (UTC).

HELEN ANITA BLISS CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 10/01/2015 HELEN ANITA BLISS CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R. and Wyatt, Ralph W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2488

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HART, KRISTIN N

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

COX, LARRY R

KENDALL, ANDREW B

 

Court Documents

Final Accounting

Final Accounting 07/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Compliance Hearing

MO COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. As of 12/1/16, the accounting has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Petition for Fees

4/20/16 MO:Petition for Fees: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION PD'S FEES 4/20/16 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition

4/20/16 MO: Petition To Establish Inter Vivos Trust re Attorney fees: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION TO ESTABLISH INTER VIVOS TRUST RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES ONLY 4/20/16 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: HART, KRISTIN N; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition

PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE 12/22/15 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner: HART, KRISTIN N; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING 12/22/15 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner: HART, KRISTIN N; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petiton for appointment of conservator 112315: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Person and Estate ***NOTE- 1. Need Family Court Service Report.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte hearing 101415: Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING REVISED NOTES- 1. Need FCS Report. 2. Need Ex Parte Compliance Declaration for proposed Coservatee, Helen Anita Bliss. 3. 6 D & 7b re declarant's initials is incomplete on Capacity Declaration filed 10/01/15. Need amended Capacity Declaration from Dr. Dougherty.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

Ruliing 10/5/15 ls: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment and Order for Final Distribution - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order approving first and final account and report of conservator, terminating conservatorship, determining ownership of assets by trustee or POD beneficiaries, and approving attorney's fees to be paid from intervivos trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt for payment in full of attorneys fees to Kern County Public Defender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Accounting - Final Accounting 07/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Response - Comment: Response to examiner's notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 07/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: First and final account and report of conservator; petition for termination of conservatorship, for determination of ownership of assets by trustee or pod beneficiaries, and for approval of attorney's fees to be paid from intervivos trust (probate code section 17200, 2620)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Compliance Hearing - MO COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. As of 12/1/16, the accounting has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE:notice of conservatee's rights pursuant to pc 1830 and level of care plan pursuant to pc 2352.5

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2015
  • Confidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Confidential Information - Comment: drivers license / color copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Confidential Information - Comment: color picture of conservatee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Referral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Confidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Confidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator-Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Comment: Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Ex Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex parte application for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.