This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:45:10 (UTC).

HAYA KLEIN CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 HAYA KLEIN CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2455

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KLEIN, EREZ

KLEIN, RONALD H

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

BOWMAN, STACY H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BOWMAN, STACY H

RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

 

Court Documents

Petition for Fees

Original Type: Petition for Fees; Petition for Fees 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Need proof of mailing to conservators, Erez Klein and Ronald H Klein.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Petition for Fees

Petition for Fees 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - COMMENT/NOTE - 1. Letters appointing Erez Klein as Conservator of the Person were issued on 05/17/16 and Letters appointing Ronald Klein as Conservator of the Estate were issued 11/17/16.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING REVISED NOTES: 1. Declaration filed 7/7/16 attaching copy of bond previously filed on 2/8/15. Although bond reflects appt as "Conservator", bond was for temporary appt & reflects effective date of 10/27/15. Need bond re petitioner's appt as Conservator. Also, petitioner's name in bond does not match order. Does not include middle initial. 2. As of 8/31/16, the $20,000 bond & Letters re Ronald have not been filed. (Letters retained in file); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Compliance Hearing

6/13/16 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 5/19/16, the $20,000 bond & Letters re Ronald have not been filed. (Letters retained in file); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Further Hearing

MO (2) Appt of Conservator and Further hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - FURTHER HEARING 02/29/16 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner: KLEIN, EREZ; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner: KLEIN, RONALD H; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for appointment of conservator 112315: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Petitioner request PC 2590 Powers per attachment 1d including the power to sell real property. See (c)(1) & (2) (JTD). 2. Need Family Court Service Report.

Review

REVIEW MEDIATION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: KLEIN, EREZ; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner: KLEIN, RONALD H; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Compliance Hearing

compliance hearing 102815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: order, letters and bond; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

Petition to appoint temp. conservator 102715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: KLEIN, EREZ; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner: KLEIN, RONALD H; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Review

Review/Mediation 101615: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Mediation; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

Petition to appoint temporary conservator 100615: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Missing attachment # 3 on petition. 2. Need character & estimated value of the conservatee's estate.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H

Ruling

Ruling 9/28/15 ls: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - Original Type: Petition for Fees; Petition for Fees 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Need proof of mailing to conservators, Erez Klein and Ronald H Klein.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 1/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketOrder for Fees/Court Investigator - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketStatus Review Investigation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketPetition for Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order After Hearing On Petition for Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - Petition for Fees 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - COMMENT/NOTE - 1. Letters appointing Erez Klein as Conservator of the Person were issued on 05/17/16 and Letters appointing Ronald Klein as Conservator of the Estate were issued 11/17/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 07/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPetition for Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator - Comment: person and estate

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.