This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 10:08:34 (UTC).

HAVENS VS HAVENS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 HAVENS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HAVENS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Louie, Chad A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1016

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Louie, Chad A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAVENS, MICHELLE

Respondent

HAVENS, JOHN B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCATEE, FRED S, II

Respondent Attorney

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/30/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 3/9/2020 PET PROPERTY CONTROL, OTHER ACCOUNTING OF FUNDS DISTRIBUTED BY THE RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: RFO- HAD PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/30/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: E-FILED Proof of Personal Service Re: Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: E-FILED Declaration Regarding Service of Dec. of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: E-FILED Notice of Demand for Prelim. Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: E-FILE Request for Order Re:Spousal Support, Attorney's Fees & Costs, Property Control and Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketResponse - Comment: E-FILED Response to Petition for Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.