This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 19:36:06 (UTC).

HASSLER VS. HASSLER

Case Summary

On 02/13/2015 HASSLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HASSLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2099

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HASSLER, CHARLOTTE ANNETTE

Respondent

HASSLER, JASON LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - 10 days - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: HASSLER, CHARLOTTE ANNETTE; HASSLER, JASON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DISMISSAL OF RESPONSE TO MARRIAGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketResponse - Comment: FOR RESPONDENT JASON LEE HASSLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Docket806U Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for HASSLER, CHARLOTTE ANNETTE (PE-1). Received from JASON LEE HASSLER. Receipt #830030 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.