Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:04:18 (UTC).

HASHIM SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 HASHIM SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Tafoya, Robert S. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2266

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Tafoya, Robert S.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

DAVIS, ANNETTE

HASHIM, PAUL

Not Classified By Court

HASHIM, ANITA B

HASHIM, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

WHITNEY, MARSHALL C

CUNNINGHAM, NIKOLE E.

LOWE, KELLEY B.

SHEFFIELD, ANDREW K

GREEN, MATTHEW H.

 

Court Documents

Motion

Motion 10/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPOINT DISCOVERY REFEREE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT REFEREE FOR DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF ANDREW SHEFFIELD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF DISCOVERY REFEREE 10/06/17 CALENDAR #01

Ruling

7/27/17 MO Ruling/Re-assignment: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

7/26/17 MO Ruling-Disqualification: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via attorney out basket

Petition

Petition 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition for approval of first trough tenth accounts current and report of co-trustee and petition for settlement of same (Prob code 17200(b)(5)) Objection filed 5/3/2017; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CUNNINGHAM, NIKOLE E.; Objector; Attorney: SHEFFIELD, ANDREW K; Petitioner; Attorney: SHEFFIELD, ANDREW K

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC - Petition for Approval of First through Tenth Accounts Current and Report of Co-Trustee and Petition for Settlement of Same [Prob. Code 17200(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketPetition - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST THROUGH TENTH ACCOUNTS CURRENT AND REPORT OF CO-TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF SAME (Prob. Code 17200(b)(5)) 10/06/17 CALENDAR #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO GOSFORD - PANAMA PARTNERS, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO JOHN RIAN ADDITION, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO WELLS FARGO BANK 10/06/17 CALENDAR #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO VALLEY REPUBLIC BANK (#2) 10/06/17 CALENDAR # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO FRUITVALE OIL PARTNERS, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO A-TEAM OIL VENTURES, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO BAKO NORTH DAKOTA GROUP, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMotion - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO ASSURANCE DEVELOPMENT, LLC 10/06/17 CALENDAR #5

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Notice of Motion and Motion to quash subpoena to Clifford & Brown Hearing Date: July 27, 2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 am Hearing Department/Division: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketRequest - Comment: Memorandum of points and authorities in support of Motion to quash subpoena to A-Team Oil Ventures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: Memorandum of points and authorities in support of Motion to quash subpoena to A-Team Oil Ventures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Anette Davis in support of petitioner's Motion to quash subpoena to (1) Clifford & Brown; (2) Fairway Oaks South, LP; (3) Valley Republic Bank; (4) Assurance Development, LLC; (5) BAKO North Dakota; (6) A Team Oil Ventures; and (7) Fruitvale Oil Partners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Nikole E. Cunningham in support of petitioner's Motion to quash subpoena to A Team Oil Ventures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Notice of Motion and Motion to quash subpoena to A-Team Oil Ventures Hearing Date: July 27, 2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 am Hearing Department/Division: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition for approval of first trough tenth accounts current and report of co-trustee and petition for settlement of same (Prob code 17200(b)(5)) Objection filed 5/3/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Objection to petition for approval of first through tenth accounts current and report of co-trustee and petition for settlement of same (prob. code section 17200(B) (5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for approval of first trough tenth accounts current and report of co-trustee and petition for settlement of same (Prob code 17200(b)(5))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN MATTHEW HARRISON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEFFIELD, ANDREW K