This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:36:37 (UTC).

HAROLD H. GRIDIRON VS.ISMAEL MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 HAROLD H GRIDIRON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ISMAEL MUNOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0412

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRIDIRON, HAROLD H.

GRIDIRON, JAMESIE M.

Defendants

KIMDAWN, LLC

MUNOZ, ISMAEL

KIMDAWN, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

02/03/16 - MO - Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

3/21/16 MO: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - CRC 3.110h: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.110(H); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

4/20/16 MO: OSC RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.110(h): Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: pursuant to CRC Rule 3.110h; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

05/11/16 MO: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal per 3.110H: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.110(h); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Default

5/23/16 MO: Default Prove-up: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Prove-Up Hearing filed by Vincent A Gorski; Parties Present Plaintiff: GRIDIRON, HAROLD H.; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff: GRIDIRON, JAMESIE M.; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Default

5/23/16 MO: Default Prove-up: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Prove-Up Hearing filed by Vincent A Gorski; Parties Present Plaintiff: GRIDIRON, HAROLD H.; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Plaintiff: GRIDIRON, JAMESIE M.; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: for failure to submit a proposed judgment as ordered by the court on 5-23-16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont 05/23/18 Submit Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (h) cont 09/13/18 Cont 05/23/18 Submit Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Plaintiff; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: for Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (h) cont 09/13/18 Cont 05/23/18 Submit Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont 05/23/18 Submit Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: for failure to submit a proposed judgment as ordered by the court on 5-23-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED Hearing Date: 5/23/18 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - 5/23/16 MO: Default Prove-up: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Prove-Up Hearing filed by Vincent A Gorski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketDefault Setting Card - Comment: Hearing Date: 05/23/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Table of Exhibits to Application and Application for Entry of Court Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Vincent A Gorski in Support of Default Judgment with Prove-up Hearing, which includes Cause of Action for Quiet Title

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to Ismael Munoz; and Kimdawn, LLC aka Kimdawn L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Kimdawn, LLC personal service 7/17/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Ismael Munoz personal service 7/17/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Request granted, Responsive pleadings to be filed by 9/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: Filed by Fawn K. Dessy, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/23/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORSKI, VINCENT A.