This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 08:13:21 (UTC).

HANEY VS TACO BELL CORP.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 HANEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TACO BELL CORP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1015

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

FOWLER, AMBER

HANEY, TEONNA

Defendant

TACO BELL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

OREN ERIC P

Defendant Attorneys

RAWLINS ANDREA

SIEVE CAROLYN E.

 

Court Documents

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

05/02/2022: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

Summons Issued and Filed

04/27/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

04/29/2022: Order to Show Cause

Complaint

04/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/02/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

06/16/2022: Answer to Complaint

Stipulation and Order

08/28/2022: Stipulation and Order

Ruling

09/21/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Joint Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TACO BELL CORPORATION|PLAINTIFF - FOWLER, AMBER|PLAINTIFF - HANEY, TEONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TACO BELL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Taco Bel Corp., via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - HANEY, TEONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Appointing Amber Fowler as Guardian Ad Litem for Teonna Haney, a minor; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FOWLER, AMBER|PLAINTIFF - HANEY, TEONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/12/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FOWLER, AMBER|PLAINTIFF - HANEY, TEONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FOWLER, AMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taco Bell of America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEVE CAROLYN