This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 16:38:09 (UTC).

HAMMOND VS THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES A LAW CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 HAMMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS ANTON ASSOCIATES A LAW CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3030

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMMOND, LISA

Defendants

ANTON, THOMAS J

THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES A LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)SC-133 MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: HAMMOND, LISA; Awarded Against: THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES A LAW CORPORATION; ANTON, THOMAS J; Amount; Damages: $5,568.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $5643.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Ruling: Small Claims Trial 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Order on Request to Postpone Trial- Linda Hammond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (SC-112A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: HAMMOND, LISA; Served: 09/21/20192:22 PM; Served: 09/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION is a litigant