This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:36:53 (UTC).

HAMM VS CHATEAU D' BAKERSFIELD, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2015 HAMM filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHATEAU D' BAKERSFIELD, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0867

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMM, SABINE

Defendants

CHATEAU D' BAKERSFIELD, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

MOHAN, ANU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOGEL, BRIAN I

Defendant Attorneys

PEARSON, JERRY W

LAHIRI, INDRA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

02/29/16 M.O. - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: VOGEL, BRIAN I

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO C.R.C 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: t/e 5 to 7 days jury both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: J/T & FCMC SET 12/5/16 9AM DEPT. 11 T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: On Complaint, entire action dismissed WITH prejudice. Endorsed copy returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Anu Mohan, In pro-per New Attorney: Indra Lahiri, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Chateau D' Bakersfield - Anu Mohan, In pro-per New Attorney: Indra Lahiri, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Filed by Jerry W. Pearson, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: RE: CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY FILED ON 10/06/2015 RULING: EXTENSION GRANTED; DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY 10/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: FILED BY JERRY PAERSON, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/15/15 Hearing Time: 830 am Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY BRIAN I. VOGEL, ESQ CMC 2/29/16 @ 830 AM D11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.