Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 06:23:09 (UTC).

HALLMARK, MICHAEL, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 HALLMARK, MICHAEL, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1060

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HALLMARK, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, SHYLA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, Mikchael Dean Hallmark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Michael Dean Hallmark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-28-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RICHARD L. MAHFOUZ II CMC 1-12-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less