This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 08:09:24 (UTC).

HAGERMAN VS LIU

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 HAGERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIU. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Barmann, Bernard C., Jr., Bradshaw, J. Eric and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAGERMAN, MICHAEL

HAGERMAN, LINDA

GRAY, PRESELEY

HAGERMAN

Defendants

KELSO, DAKOTA

LIU, MORLAN

LIU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL, JASON S

Defendant Attorneys

FLYNN, LAURA S.

FLYNN, LAURA S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/23/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service : Document was processed, however the Judicial Form POS-010 is the standard form for Proof of Service. Also, the Plaintiff and Defendant names were placed in the wrong areas. Please review.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/13/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 7/7/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 12-16 DAYS JURY FOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 5/8/23 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 12-16 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/13/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 7/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Defendant's Case Management Conference Statement on pleading

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/23/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Morlan Liu via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/20/202112:29 PM; Served: 05/20/20213:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/23/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liu (DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF, Chun is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLYNN, LAURA S.