This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:11 (UTC).

HAGAN VS BERTRAND

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 HAGAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BERTRAND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1914

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAGAN, ANDRE

Respondent

BERTRAND, DEANNA HAGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less